Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039676

EP1039676 - Multiresolution transmission, in particular with multicarrier signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Mitsuaki
115-3, Tatsumi-cho, Katsura Minami
Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date00114694.326.03.1993
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1992006793426.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6793492
JP1992025607025.09.1992         Original published format: JP 25607092
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039676
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039676
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039676
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L27/02, H04L27/18, H04L27/26, H04L27/34
[2001/38]
Former International [2000/39]H04L1/00, H04L27/02, H04L27/18, H04L27/26, H04L27/34, H04N7/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Übertragung mit mehreren Auflösungen, insbesondere mit Mehrträgersignalen[2000/39]
English:Multiresolution transmission, in particular with multicarrier signals[2000/39]
French:Transmission multiporteuse, en particulier avec signaux multiporteuses[2000/39]
Examination procedure08.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
09.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2002Fee for grant paid
31.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93302369.9  / EP0562875
Opposition(s)27.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0448492  (FRANCE ETAT [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 13 - line 18 * * page 3, line 33 - line 44 * * page 4, line 21 - line 22 * * page 4, line 32 - line 34 *;
 [XP]EP0506400  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-6 * page 3, line 4 - line 8 * * page 12, line 15 - line 17 * * page 16, line 12 - line 23 *;
 [A]  COVER, "Broadcast channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, New York, US, (197201), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2 - 14, XP000760860 [A] 1-6 * page 3, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1972.1054727
 [XP]  SCHREIBER, "Spread-spectrum television broadcasting", SMPTE JOURNAL, Scarsdale, US, (199208), vol. 101, no. 8, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 538 - 549, XP000296026 [XP] 1-6 * page 540, column R, paragraph 5 - page 541, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 541, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 542, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 543, column R, paragraph 2 *