blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1069098

EP1069098 - Process for the synthesis of cyclododecatrienes with recycling of the catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
Weissfrauenstrasse 9
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wilczok, Norbert
Elly-Heuss-Knapp-Strasse 8
45481 Mühlheim / DE
02 / Wiedenbusch, Peter
Merkurstrasse 24
45772 Marl / DE
03 / Schiffer, Thomas, Dr.
Heckenweg 14
45721 Haltern / DE
 [2001/03]
Application number, filing date00114749.508.07.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateDE199913257713.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19932577
DE200010246021.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10002460
[2001/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1069098
Date:17.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069098
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2000
ClassificationIPC:C07C2/46
[2001/03]
CPC:
C07C2/46 (EP,US); C07C2/465 (EP,US); C07C2527/135 (EP,US);
C07C2531/22 (EP,US); C07C2601/20 (EP,US); Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C2/465, C07C13/277 (US,EP);
C07C2/46, C07C13/277 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cyclododecatrienen mit Rückführung des Katalysators[2001/03]
English:Process for the synthesis of cyclododecatrienes with recycling of the catalyst[2001/03]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de cyclododécatriènes avec recyclage du catalyseur[2001/03]
Examination procedure08.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
26.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Fee for grant paid
11.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
IT04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
AT08.07.2003
CY08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2005/11]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
AT08.07.2003
CY08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2005/02]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
CY08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/39]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
CY08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/36]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
CY08.07.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/29]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/22]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/15]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/10]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE1283836  (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH) [DX] 1-12 * column 1, line 44 - line 58 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US3723553  (WU C, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 17 * * examples 1-9 *;
 [DA]DE2825341  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * * table 3 *;
 [A]US4270016  (TOLSTIKOV GENRIKH A, et al) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.