Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066824

EP1066824 - Use of a stimulative perfume composition comprising anisaldehyde [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/02]Stimulative agent and stimulative perfume composition
[2010/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2016New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[2010/36]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shoji, Ken
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tzuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi KANAGAWA 224-8558 / JP
02 / Hirose, Seiichi
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tzuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi KANAGAWA 224-8558 / JP
03 / Taguchi, Sumie
c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tzuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi KANAGAWA 224-8558 / JP
 [2010/31]
Former [2001/02]01 / Shoji, Ken
Shiseido Research C., 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP
02 / Hirose, Seiichi
Shiseido Research C., 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP
03 / Taguchi, Sumie
Shiseido Research C., 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00114790.910.07.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateJP1999019629509.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19629599
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1066824
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1066824
Date:14.05.2003
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066824
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61Q13/00, A61K8/33
[2010/10]
Former International [2003/19]A61K7/46, A61K35/78
Former International [2001/02]A61K7/46
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/06]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Die Verwendung einer Riechstoffzusammensetzung enthaltend Anisaldehyd[2010/08]
English:Use of a stimulative perfume composition comprising anisaldehyde[2010/08]
French:Utilisation d'une composition de parfum stimulante comprenant de l'anisaldehyde[2010/09]
Former [2001/02]Reizmittel und anreizende Riechstoffzusammensetzung
Former [2001/02]Stimulative agent and stimulative perfume composition
Former [2001/02]Agent stimulant et composition de parfum stimulante
Examination procedure04.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
16.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
31.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.02.2010
02.02.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2010Fee for grant paid
24.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011   
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 [2011/29]
15.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.11.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.01.2013Appeal received No.  T0158/13
13.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
17.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
17.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL08.09.2010
[2011/17]
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH01254629  ;
 [DA]JPH06172781  ;
 [A]US4670463  (WARREN CRAIG B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4995407  (KOSSIAKOFF NICOLAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  ARCTANDER S, PERFUME AND FLAVOR CHEMICALS (AROMA CHEMICALS). A - J, MONTCLAIR, N.J. USA, S. ARCTANDER, XP002235168 [A] 1-10 * page 241 - page 242 *
 [A]  BUCHBAUER G ET AL, "FRAGRANCE COMPOUNDS AND ESSENTIAL OILS WITH SEDATIVE EFFECTS UPON INHALATION", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION. WASHINGTON, US, (1993), vol. 82, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 660 - 664, XP000960638 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600820623
 [DA]  vol. 014, no. 007, Database accession no. (C - 673), [DA] 1-10 * abstract *
 [DA]  vol. 018, no. 517, Database accession no. (C - 1254), [DA] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicant   JPH06172781 A 19940621