blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1066824 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1066824



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 515
29.11.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.11.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.11.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
19.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.11.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
19.11.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 1
19.11.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
19.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.08.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
09.08.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
09.08.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
03.08.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
20.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.07.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 10
06.06.2017 Description Opposition 10
06.06.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.03.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.02.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
08.02.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
23.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
23.11.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
16.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.11.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
10.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.08.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
24.08.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
10.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
02.08.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
29.07.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
03.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.03.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.03.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
25.01.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.01.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
19.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
07.11.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
07.11.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
07.11.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.11.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
07.11.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
10.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
02.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
20.03.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2012 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
25.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
24.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.06.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.06.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
10.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.06.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.06.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
24.06.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.02.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.02.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.02.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.02.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
26.01.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Description Search / examination 12
04.01.2010 Description Search / examination 12
04.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
04.01.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
09.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.10.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.10.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.08.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.08.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.09.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
24.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.09.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.09.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
19.05.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.08.2000 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Description Search / examination 21
10.07.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.2000 Drawings Search / examination 2
10.07.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6