blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1066824


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2018 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.11.2018 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
08.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.07.2018 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
23.10.2017 Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision
11.08.2017 Change - German title published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
11.08.2017 Change - French title published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
21.07.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
04.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
09.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
27.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
22.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
03.08.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
22.01.2013 Change: Appeal number
11.01.2013 New entry: Appeal number
11.01.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
06.11.2012 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
30.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2012 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
26.01.2012 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2011 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.07.2011 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.06.2011 Opposition filed published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
25.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.04.2011  [2011/17]
06.08.2010 (Expected) grant published on  08.09.2010  [2010/36]
31.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2010 Change - inventor published on  04.08.2010  [2010/31]
01.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.02.2010 Change - classification published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
05.02.2010 Change - classification published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
04.02.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.01.2010 Change - French title published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
27.01.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
22.01.2010 Change - German title published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]
26.09.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.03.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.01.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.08.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.08.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.01.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.09.2006 First examination report
02.09.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.09.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.04.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
14.04.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
19.12.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  04.02.2004  [2004/06]
08.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2003 Request for examination filed published on  03.09.2003  [2003/36]
28.03.2003 Publication of search report published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
21.03.2003 Change - classification published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
13.08.2002 Renewal fee
24.11.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]