blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1066824

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NLLapse: 08.09.2010
Examination procedure24.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted08.09.2010
Opposition procedure19.11.2018Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition07.01.2013APPEAL FILED
13.03.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
17.11.2016APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 7/46 A
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 35/78 B
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:03.09.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030704
 
Event date:04.02.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050916
 
Event date:24.02.2010 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:USE OF A STIMULATIVE PERFUME COMPOSITION COMPRISING ANISALDEHYDE
 
Event date:10.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61Q 13/00 20060101AFI20100203BHEP
 
Event date:10.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/33 20060101ALI20100203BHEP
 
Event date:04.08.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SHOJI, KEN
 
Event date:04.08.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:HIROSE, SEIICHI
 
Event date:04.08.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:TAGUCHI, SUMIE
 
Event date:08.09.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:08.09.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:21.10.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60044925
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20101021
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20100908
 
Event date:11.01.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20101228
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100908
 
Event date:20.07.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:BEIERSDORF AG
Effective DATE:20110608
 
Event date:08.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 60044925 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20110608
 
Event date:21.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:24.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180725
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180724
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180829
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180719
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:26.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 60044925 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
 
Event date:26.12.2018 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20181226
 
Event date:26.12.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:14.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 2349760 ES T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
Effective DATE:20190614