Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077151

EP1077151 - Headrest drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO AG
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kober, Rainer
Schlossstrasse 33
64297 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Neis, Peter
Quarzweg 2
65604 Elz / DE
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2001/08]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date00114820.411.07.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateDE199913934919.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19939349
[2001/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077151
Date:21.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077151
Date:23.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/02, B60N2/48
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/46]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kopfstützenantrieb[2001/08]
English:Headrest drive[2001/08]
French:Motorisation pour appui-tête[2001/08]
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
11.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2003Fee for grant paid
03.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2011648  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-8,17-20 * page 3, line 1 - line 73; figures 2,5,8-11E *;
 [A]DE4304663  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,8-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29723240U  (FAURE BERTRAND SITZTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * figures 5,6; claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]DE4023127  (MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,9-16 * figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *;
 [AD]DE3637362  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [AD] 1 * abstract *