Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077430

EP1077430 - Apparatus and method for reconstruction of volumetric images in a computed tomography system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.11.2005  [2005/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ANALOGIC CORPORATION
8 Centennial Drive, Centennial Industrial Park Peabody
Massachusetts 01960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
ANALOGIC CORPORATION
8 Centennial Drive, Centennial Industrial Park
Peabody, Massachusetts 01960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lai, Ching-Ming
34 Montrose Avenue
Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Feldkamp, Rainer , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date00114853.511.07.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateUS1999037467916.08.1999         Original published format: US 374679
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077430
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077430
Date:27.08.2003
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2004/21]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichting und Verfahren zur Rekonstruktion von volumetrischen Bilddaten aus tomographischen Daten[2001/08]
English:Apparatus and method for reconstruction of volumetric images in a computed tomography system[2001/08]
French:Dispositif et méthode pour la reconstruction d'images volumétriques à partir de données tomographiques[2001/08]
Examination procedure20.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
21.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
28.09.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DY]US5802134  (LARSON GREGORY L [US], et al) [DY] 1-5,9-17,21-24 * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 54 *;
 [Y]WO9830980  (EDHOLM PAUL [SE], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-17,21-24 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9824063  (ELSCINT LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 5 *;
 [X]  HEUSCHER, D.J., "Helical Cone Beam Scans Using Oblique 2D Surface Reconstructions.", INTERNATIONAL MEETING ON FULLY THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION IN RADIOLOGY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE., NL, (19990623), pages 204 - 207, XP002238526 [X] 25 * /* the whole document */ *
 [A]  TANAKA E ET AL, "Simulation studies on a pseudo-three-dimensional reconstruction algorithm for volume imaging in multi-ring PET", SECOND INTERNATIONAL MEETING ON FULLY THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION IN RADIOLOGY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE, SNOWBIRD, UT, USA, 23-25 JUNE 1993, Physics in Medicine and Biology, March 1994, UK, vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 389 - 400, XP002238789 [A] 1-27 * page 390, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/39/3/007