Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1073150

EP1073150 - Socket for a printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.04.2009  [2009/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.
Helftheuvelweg 11
5202 CB'S-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2001/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Shoichi Omote
2-25-23, Nishiogu
Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus , et al
De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/10]van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus , et al
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [2001/05]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00114977.220.07.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateJP1999021132226.07.1999         Original published format: JP 21132299
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1073150
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1073150
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/18
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steckbuchse für gedruckte Leiterplatte[2001/05]
English:Socket for a printed circuit board[2001/05]
French:Douille pour carte de circuits imprimés[2001/05]
Examination procedure30.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
03.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.08.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
29.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2008Fee for grant paid
16.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/16]
24.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.06.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0542433  (AMPHENOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 27; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [XA]EP0797276  (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 36; figures 1-5,11-13 * [A] 4;
 [XA]EP0546804  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 27 - line 55; figures 1,3 * [A] 4