EP1070894 - Cable support and distribution system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon Ohio 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon, Ohio 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laughlin, Raymond S. 11207 Wadsworth Ave. Garfield Heights, Ohio 44125 / US | 02 /
Di Francisco, John A. 9961 Darrow Park Drive, Apt.I11 D Twinsburg, Ohio 44087 / US | 03 /
Lynch, Edward J., Jr. 932 Genesee Road Akron, Ohio 44303 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114989.7 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US19990145322 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: US 145322 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070894 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070894 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070894 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/30, F16L3/14, H02G3/04, F16L3/26 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
F16L3/22 (EP,US);
F16L3/14 (EP);
F16L3/24 (EP,US);
H02G3/0443 (EP);
H02G3/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | F16L3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/38] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kabelträger und Verteilungssystem und Verfahren | [2001/04] | English: | Cable support and distribution system and method | [2001/04] | French: | Support de câble et système et méthode de distribution | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0891028 (ERICO INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1066155 (WALTER HENRY FLETCHER, et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [YD]US5740994 (LAUGHLIN RAYMOND SCOTT [US]) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US5215280 (TIGRETT CHARLES R [US]) [X] 5,12 * figure 7; claim 12 *; | [A]FR2017070 (RIETH & CO) [A] 20 * the whole document * |