Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1126674

EP1126674 - Method and device for presenting data to a user [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ravenpack AG
Tal 34
80331 München / DE
[2001/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Schloer, Hardy
Lilienstrasse 2
D-81669 München / DE
 [2001/34]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00115147.112.07.2000
[2001/34]
Priority number, dateDE199916293724.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19962937
DE200012384316.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10023843
[2001/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1126674
Date:22.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1126674
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1126674
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2001/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Bereitstellung von Daten für einen Benutzer[2001/34]
English:Method and device for presenting data to a user[2001/34]
French:Procédé et appareil de présentation de données pour un utilisateur[2001/34]
Examination procedure17.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/25]
28.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2006Fee for grant paid
22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
CY04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
FR04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2008/52]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
FR04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2008/23]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
FR25.05.2007
Former [2008/19]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/37]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/35]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/30]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/28]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/26]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/21]NL04.10.2006
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/19]NL04.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]  DAVIS J ET AL, "@?Drop-in@? publishing with the World Wide Web", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951201), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 247 - 255, XP004001231 [A] 1-42 * abstract * * page 248, column L, line 35 - page 250, column R, line 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00091-2
 [A]  LEMIEUX J R, "Using RAD Tools to Develop Secure Client/Server Applications", COMPUTERS & SECURITY. INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO THE STUDY OF TECHNICAL AND FINANCIAL ASPECTS OF COMPUTER SECURITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0167-4048, pages 289 - 295, XP004025155 [A] 1-42 * abstract * * page 289, column R, line 8 - page 290, column L, line 18 * * page 292, column R, line 26 - page 294, column L, line 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(96)88940-1