Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036570

EP1036570 - Non-occluding catheter bolus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RADIUS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
21860 West Washington Street
Grayslake, IL 60030 / US
[2000/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Quinn, David, G.
21860 West Washington Street
Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00115171.114.06.1994
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateUS1993007701915.06.1993         Original published format: US 77019
US1994021744624.03.1994         Original published format: US 217446
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1036570
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1036570
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036570
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00, A61M1/00, A61J15/00, A61M25/00
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/38]A61M25/00, A61M1/00, A61M5/00, A61J15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Katheterkopf, der sich nicht verstopft[2004/03]
English:Non-occluding catheter bolus[2000/38]
French:Tête de catheter ne s'obstruant pas[2000/38]
Former [2000/38]Nicht eingeschlossener Kathederbolus
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
19.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2004Fee for grant paid
20.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94920171.9  / EP0746349
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XD]US4594074  (ANDERSEN ERIK [US], et al) [XD] 1-7 * column 5, line 30 - line 33; figures 3,7,8 *;
 [X]US4311140  (BRIDGMAN HENRY) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 48 - line 54; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2116083  (WILLY RUSCH) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 12; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB745379  (ERNEST ALBERT MANSELL, et al) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 16 - line 52; figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS4594074
 US4410320
 US4390017
 US4388076