blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1068838

EP1068838 - Reclining chair for medical use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
26.03.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TECNODENT S.p.A.
Via 63a Brigata Bolero, 24
40033 Casalecchio di Reno (Bologna) / IT
[2001/34]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Lenzi, Gino
Piazza Kennedy, 1
40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Negrini, Elena
Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6
40141 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Negrini, Elena
Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6
40141 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date00115280.014.07.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateIT1999BO0040316.07.1999         Original published format: IT BO990403
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1068838
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1068838
Date:04.04.2001
[2001/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61B19/00
[2001/03]
CPC:
A61B90/60 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/01]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verstellbarer Arztstuhl[2001/03]
English:Reclining chair for medical use[2001/03]
French:Chaise adaptable pour médecins[2001/03]
Examination procedure26.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
29.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8501643  (CONGLETON JEROME J) [Y] 2 * page 10, line 21 - line 24; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4818020  (MEILLER HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 3,4,8-10* column A; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE8903118U  (MÖLLER J D OPTISCHE WERKE) [Y] 5 * page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [XA]DE3933815  (MENZEL MANUEL DR [DE]) [X] 1,7,11 * column 3, line 9 - line 25; figure 2 * [A] 3,4,12;
 [XY]WO9401050  (KURZE ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1,7,11 * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 2; figures 3,4 * [Y] 2,5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.