Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074377

EP1074377 - Method of cooling containers made of thermoplastic material and stacking device for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, ES
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adolf Illig Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 10
74081 Heilbronn / DE
[2002/28]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Adolf Illig Maschinenbau GmbH & Co
Mauerstrasse 100
D-74081 Heilbronn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Karbach, Helmut
Moldaustrasse 1
74172 Neckarsulm / DE
 [2001/06]
Application number, filing date00115297.414.07.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateDE199913728806.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19937288
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1074377
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1074377
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074377
Date:03.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B29C51/44, B29C51/42
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kühlen von Behältern aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff und Stapeleinrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2003/13]
English:Method of cooling containers made of thermoplastic material and stacking device for carrying out the method[2001/06]
French:Procédé pour refroidir des récipients en matière thermoplastique et dispositif d'empilage pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé[2001/06]
Former [2001/06]Verfahren zum Kühlen von Behältern aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff und Stapeleinrichtung zur Durchfürung des Verfahrens
Examination procedure22.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
14.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2003Fee for grant paid
03.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.09.2003
ES03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
[2007/08]
Former [2006/14]FI03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/31]FI03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/29]FI03.09.2003
IE03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/16]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI03.09.2003
NL03.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI03.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29608477U  (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19509057  (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3601937  (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2517981  (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF) [A] 1,6,7 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]CH625742  (OMV SPA OFF MECC VERONESE [IT]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure 8 *;
 [A]US4622800  (TURTSCHAN ALFONS [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure 8 *