blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1069459

EP1069459 - Mounting structure for liquid crystal modules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/03]Liquid crystal module mounting structure
[2004/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kan-o, Toshiaki
c/o NEC Yonezawa, Ltd., 6-80-2, Shimohanazawa
Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata / JP
 [2006/52]
Former [2001/03]01 / Kan-o, Toshiaki
c/o NEC Yonezawa, ltd., 6-80-2, Shimohanazawa
Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/03]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00115337.814.07.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateJP1999020189515.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20189599
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069459
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069459
Date:11.08.2004
[2004/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069459
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/13
[2006/27]
CPC:
G02F1/133308 (EP,US); G02F2201/46 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2001/03]G02F1/1335
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2005/18]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Montagerahmen für Flüssigkristallanzeigemodule[2004/44]
English:Mounting structure for liquid crystal modules[2004/44]
French:Cadre de montage pour des modules d'affichage à cristaux liquides[2004/44]
Former [2001/03]Montagestrukturmodul für eine Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung
Former [2001/03]Liquid crystal module mounting structure
Former [2001/03]Structure modulaire de cadre pour affichage à cristaux liquides
Examination procedure01.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
26.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2006Fee for grant paid
03.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH116998  ;
 [A]JPH09288455  ;
 [PA]US5946061  (KURIHARA MIKIO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-8;
 [PA]US6034751  (KAMIYA SHINICHI [JP]) [PA] 1-8* figures 6-8 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11006998 A 19990112 (INTERNATL BUSINESS MACH CORP ) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09288455 A 19971104 (NEC SHIZUOKA LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.