Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074603

EP1074603 - Method and apparatus for producing oxide-nanocrystals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2017New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEDVANCE GmbH
Parkring 29 - 33
85748 Garching / DE
[2017/29]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Konrad, Armin
Breitweg 13
86830 Schwabmünchen / DE
02 / Fries, Torsten, Dr.
Goethestrasse 6
86391 Stadtbergen / DE
03 / Gahn, Alfred-Georg, Dr.
Im Saatwinkel 29
13599 Berlin / DE
04 / Kummer, Franz, Dr.
Schleissheimer Strasse 121
80797 München / DE
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date00115377.415.07.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateDE199913686805.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19936868
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1074603
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1074603
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/08, C01B13/20
[2017/39]
Former International [2001/19]C09K11/08, C01B13/20, C09K11/46
Former International [2001/06]C09K11/08, C01B13/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von oxidischen Nanokristallen[2001/06]
English:Method and apparatus for producing oxide-nanocrystals[2001/06]
French:Procédé et dispositif de production de nanocristaux d'oxyde[2001/06]
Examination procedure05.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
19.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
18.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
20.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]US5851507  (PIRZADA SHAHID [US], et al) [X] 1,3,12-16,18,23 * column 6, line 15 - column 9, line 48; figures 13,14; examples 4,5,9 *;
 [X]  - HAHN, "Gas phase synthesis of nanocrystalline materials", NANOSTRUCT. MATER., (1997), vol. 9, pages 3 - 12, XP002163273 [X] 1-3,8,9,11-14,16,18 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 4; table 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0965-9773(97)00013-5
 [X]  - SCHLEICH ET AL., "Formation of nanoparticles by vapor phase reactions of titanium tetraisopropoxide in oxygen/ozone containing atmospheres", NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS, (1997), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 579 - 586, XP002163274 [X] 1,3,8,10-14,16,18,19,23 * page 580, line 29 - page 581, line 11; figure 1 * * page 582, line 1 - line 17; figures 3,5; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0965-9773(97)00191-8
 [X]  - CHAN ET AL, "Effects of calcination on the microstructures and photocatalytic properties of nanosized titanium dioxide powders prepared by vapor hydrolysis.", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (1999), vol. 82, no. 3, pages 566 - 572, XP002163275 [X] 1,3,8,9,11-13 * page 567, column L, line 4 - line 33; figure 1 * * page 568, column R, line 33 - line 49; figure 7; table 1 *
 [X]  - TISSUE, "Synthesis and luminescence of lanthanide ions in nanoscale insulating hosts", CHEM. MATER., (1998), vol. 10, pages 2837 - 2845, XP000782392 [X] 24,25 * page 2840 - page 2841; figures 2-4; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm9802245
 [XY]  - KOTTAISAMY M ET AL, "Yttrium oxide:Eu/sup 3+/ red phosphor by self-propagating high temperature synthesis", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, AUG. 1996, ELSEVIER, USA, vol. 31, no. 8, ISSN 0025-5408, pages 1013 - 1020, XP002163276 [X] 24 * figure 3; table 2 * * page 1015, line 1 - line 11; figures 2,3; tables 1,2 * * page 1018, line 1 - line 2 * [Y] 25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0025-5408(96)00077-3
 [Y]  - MARTIN ET AL., "41-1105", DATABASE JCPDS, (1989), XP002163277 [Y] 25 * abstract *