Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063299

EP1063299 - A method of producing a taxane-type diterpene and method of obtaining cultured cells which produce the taxane-type diterpene at a high rate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6070 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6070 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yukimune, Yukihito, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
02 / Hara, Yosuhiro, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
03 / Higashi, Yosuke, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
04 / Ohnishi, Naoto, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
05 / Tabata, Homare, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
06 / Suga, Chuzo, c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2, Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
07 / Matsubara, Kouichi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2 Waki 6-chome, Wakicho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/52]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00115405.309.11.1994
[2000/52]
Priority number, dateJP1993028489315.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28489393
JP1994003615607.03.1994         Original published format: JP 3615694
JP1994010421118.05.1994         Original published format: JP 10421194
JP1994010421218.05.1994         Original published format: JP 10421294
JP1994010421318.05.1994         Original published format: JP 10421394
JP1994014682628.06.1994         Original published format: JP 14682694
JP1994020115025.08.1994         Original published format: JP 20115094
JP1994020115125.08.1994         Original published format: JP 20115194
JP1994025252818.10.1994         Original published format: JP 25252894
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1063299
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1063299
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12P17/02, C12N5/04
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/52]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Herstellung von Taxan-Typ Diterpen und Methode zur Gewinnung von Kulturzellen die Taxan-Typ Diterpen in hohen Ausbeuten herstellen[2000/52]
English:A method of producing a taxane-type diterpene and method of obtaining cultured cells which produce the taxane-type diterpene at a high rate[2000/52]
French:Méthode de production d'un diterpène du type taxane et méthode d'obtention de cellules de culture produisant le diterpène du type taxane à haut rendement[2000/52]
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
07.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
04.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
03.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
22.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/04]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94931697.0  / EP0683232
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO9317121  (PHYTON CATALYTIC INC [US], et al) [DX] 1 * examples 7-9; claim -; tables 1.A.III,1.B,2 * [Y] 2-10;
 [DY]DE4122208  (B.A.T. CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH) [DY] 2-10 * the whole document *;
 EP0521435  [ ] (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE])