Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072244

EP1072244 - Absorbent article comprising flocked fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road Skillman
New Jersey 08558 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
McNEIL-PPC, INC.
Grandview Road
Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
McNEIL-PPC, INC.
Grandview Avenue
Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lasko, Vincent P.
114 Holly Hill Drive
New Egypt, NJ 08533 / US
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Groening, Hans Wilhelm
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing.
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date00115482.218.07.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateUS1999035694719.07.1999         Original published format: US 356947
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1072244
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1072244
Date:23.05.2001
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1072244
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/538, A61F13/539, A61F13/15
[2001/21]
Former International [2001/05]A61F13/538, A61F13/539
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/08]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Absorbierender Artikel mit flockigen Fasern[2004/04]
English:Absorbent article comprising flocked fibers[2001/05]
French:Article absorbant comprenant des fibres floquées[2001/05]
Former [2001/05]Absorbierender Artikel mit beflockten Fasern
Examination procedure13.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2004Fee for grant paid
18.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0976375  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1,3,7,8,10 * column 11, line 53 - column 19, line 17 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]EP1070492  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [E] 1-13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-23 *;
 [X]US4324246  (MULLANE WILLIAM I, et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 9, line 1 - line 45 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4459332  (GIGLIA ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 39 *;
 [X]DE3214354  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON BABY PROD [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * figures 1-7; example 1 *;
 [X]EP0374910  (STEEN & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-10 * column 5, line 5 - column 7, line 49 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0861646  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 1-5B *;
 [A]BE1007041  (FILIPOVIC DRAGOMIR [BE]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9825560  (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * page 4, line 23 - page 12, line 6 * * page 14, line 15 - page 15, line 19 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9405244  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,3,7 * figure 9 * * page 18, line 14 - page 19, line 23 *;
 [A]DE9307894U  (COROVIN GMBH) [A] 1,3 * page 12, line 4 - line 14 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3967623  (BUTTERWORTH GEORGE A M, et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 11 - line 25 *;
 [A]EP0661030  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 18, line 38 - page 19, line 48; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]WO9734507  (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 17 - page 12, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *