blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1076458

EP1076458 - Twin converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
Kathrein-Werke KG
Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Exler, Ralf
Sepp-Strassberger-Strasse 26
83059 Kolbermoor / DE
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Andrae Flach Haug Prinzregentenstrasse 24
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Application number, filing date00115642.120.07.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateDE1999214050U12.08.1999         Original published format: DE 29914050 U
[2001/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1076458
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1076458
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076458
Date:06.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/20, H04H1/00
[2001/37]
CPC:
H04H40/90 (EP); H04H20/63 (EP); H04N21/6143 (EP);
H04N7/20 (EP); H04N5/4446 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/07]H04N7/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
TitleGerman:Twin-Konverter[2001/07]
English:Twin converter[2001/07]
French:Biconvertisseur[2001/07]
Examination procedure13.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/06]
20.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2005Fee for grant paid
21.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
CY20.07.2005
LU20.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/20]FI06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
CY20.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/08]FI06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/28]FI06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/23]FI06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19543717  (DETTERBECK ANNA [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, line 67 - column 8, line 6; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]DE29716786U  (YEN KERL [TW]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 14 - line 25 * * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 2; figure 3 *;
 [A]  - MANN U, FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, VOL. 67, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 82-85, ISSN 0016-2841, XP000494872 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.