Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1073163

EP1073163 - Device for feeding cable ends to a cable harness assembly apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Komax Holding AG
Industriestrasse 6
6036 Dierikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
komax Holding AG
Industriestrasse 6
6036 Dierikon / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Meisser, Claudio, Dipl.-Ing. ETH
Moosstrasse 14
6330 Cham / CH
02 / Lustenberger, Alois
Zimmeregg 4
6014 Littau / CH
03 / Stocker, Martin
Grepperstrasse 47
6403 Küssnacht / CH
04 / Gasperi, Roberto
Ottigenbühlring 28
6030 Ebikon / CH
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Blöchle, Hans
Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55 Postfach
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Blöchle, Hans
Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55, Postfach
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Application number, filing date00115707.221.07.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateEP1999081067226.07.1999         Original published format: EP 99810672
[2001/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1073163
Date:31.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1073163
Date:14.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R43/052
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/42]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur linearen Zubringung von Kabelenden zu Konfektioniereinheiten[2001/05]
English:Device for feeding cable ends to a cable harness assembly apparatus[2001/05]
French:Dispositif de transport d'extrémités de câble pour une unité de confection de câbles[2001/05]
Examination procedure18.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
28.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2002Fee for grant paid
18.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0302804  (RICARD CLAUDE) [A] 1-7 * column 11, line 9 - line 13 *;
 [A]US4858311  (KOCH MAX [CH]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 49 - column 12, line 11 *;
 [A]CH673858  (MEGOMAT AG) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 50 - page 4, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0876885  (KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 15 *