Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056095

EP1056095 - Adjustable output driver circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 S. Federal Way
Boise, ID 83707 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 S. Federal Way
Boise, ID 83707 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Keeth, Brent
5077 North Fifshire Place
Boise, Idaho 83713 / US
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00115868.218.12.1997
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateUS1997077934406.01.1997         Original published format: US 779344
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1056095
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1056095
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1056095
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11C7/10, H03K17/16
[2000/51]
Former International [2000/48]G11C7/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:Einstellbare Ausgangstreiberschaltung[2000/48]
English:Adjustable output driver circuit[2000/48]
French:Circuit d'attaque de sortie ajustable[2000/48]
Examination procedure24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
25.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2002Fee for grant paid
28.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97953418.7  / EP0950247
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
LU18.12.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
MC01.07.2003
[2007/26]
Former [2007/10]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
MC01.07.2003
Former [2006/44]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
MC01.07.2003
Former [2006/14]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/18]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
LU06.01.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/04]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/01]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
IE18.12.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/51]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0599631  (INMOS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0340731  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *