blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1074804

EP1074804 - Thermal insulating door for a refrigerator or a freezing compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2004/05]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Strobel, Manfred
Apothekergasse 5
89129 Langenau / DE
02 / Lang, Werner
Stockbergstrasse 1
89428 Syrgenstein / DE
03 / Stickel, Harald
Mörikestrasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
 [2001/06]
Application number, filing date00116040.726.07.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateDE199913641903.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19936419
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1074804
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1074804
Date:16.08.2001
[2001/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:F25D23/08, F25D23/02, E06B7/23
[2001/06]
CPC:
B29C45/16 (EP); F25D23/087 (EP); B29L2031/265 (EP);
B29L2031/724 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/19]
Former [2001/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI18.02.2002
TitleGerman:Wärmeisolierende Tür für ein Kältegerät oder ein Gefrierfach[2001/06]
English:Thermal insulating door for a refrigerator or a freezing compartment[2001/06]
French:Porte thermiquement isolée pour un réfrigérateur ou un compartiment de congélation[2001/06]
Examination procedure18.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
29.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/50]
28.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/50]
Request for further processing for:14.06.2004Request for further processing filed
14.06.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.07.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PXA]EP0942245  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [PX] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * claims 1-8 * * figures 3-6 * [A] 5,6;
 [Y]US5533311  (TIRRELL STEVEN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 22 * * column 8, line 32 - column 10, line 1 * * claims 1-4,6 * * figures 14,15 *;
 [Y]EP0341880  (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 8 - column 4, line 23 * * claims 1-12 * * figures 1B,2A-C,3A-C,4,5,7A,7B, *;
 [A]US5551192  (AVENDANO JOSE G [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * * claims 1,18 * * figures 2,3,7,9,10 *;
 [A]JPH0431019  ;
 [A]GB295382  (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920514), vol. 016, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 1247), & JP04031019 A 19920203 (THREE BOND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.