Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162556

EP1162556 - Method for computerbased mediation between a seller and the purchase request of a buyer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Müske, Heiner, Dr.
Rehhecke 17
40885 Ratingen / DE
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00116132.231.07.2000
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateDE200012791006.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10027910
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162556
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162556
Date:20.03.2002
[2002/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2001/50]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/50]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur computergestützen Vermittlung einer Kaufanfrage eines Kaufinteressenten an einen Anbieter[2001/50]
English:Method for computerbased mediation between a seller and the purchase request of a buyer[2001/50]
French:Méthode de médiation entre un vendeur et une ordre d'achat d'un acheteur[2001/50]
Examination procedure21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
23.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.10.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.10.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.10.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5742931  (SPIEGELHOFF STEVEN P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 17 * * column 7, line 59 - column 7, line 67 * * column 11, line 22 - column 11, line 53 *;
 [X]US5715402  (POPOLO CARL A [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 7,8 * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 12 * * column 5, line 20 - column 10, line 36 *;
 [A]WO9934272  (POOL ED [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 20 *;
 [A]WO9914698  (MAINTENET CORP [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * page 16, line 1 - page 16, line 10 *;
 [A]US5710887  (CHELLIAH RAMAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *