Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050674

EP1050674 - Air flow rate control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2013Opposition rejectedpublished on 15.05.2013  [2013/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamimura, Yasuhiro
511-1, Ichige
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
02 / Sasaki, Yasushi
1800-42, Hirano, Urizuramachi
Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Aoki, Sadayuki
40, Takahamacho-3-chome
Takahagi-shi / JP
04 / Nagayama, Kazuo
2300-12 Kouya, Hitachinaka-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
 [2001/09]
Former [2000/45]01 / Kamimura, Yasuhiro
511-1, Ichige
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
02 / Sasaki, Yasushi
1800-42, Hirano, Urizuramachi
Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Aoki, Sadayuki
40, Takahamacho-3-chome
Takahagi-shi / JP
04 / Nagayama, Kazuo
209-6, Higashiishikawa
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2004/16]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/45]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116246.016.01.1996
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateJP1995000467317.01.1995         Original published format: JP 467395
JP1995000618919.01.1995         Original published format: JP 618995
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050674
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050674
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050674
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D11/10
[2000/46]
Former International [2000/45]F02D11/00, F02D9/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Lüftströmungssteuervorrichtung[2000/45]
English:Air flow rate control apparatus[2000/45]
French:Dispositif de commande de débit d'air[2000/45]
Examination procedure08.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
31.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2002Fee for grant paid
19.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96100543.6  / EP0723072
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2004  29.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Liermann-Castell
Am Rurufer 2
52349 Düren / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/29]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2004  29.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 76
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Former [2004/12]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2004  29.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AG
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 76
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zmyj, Erwin, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., European Patent Attorney
Rosenheimer Strasse 52
81669 München / DE
05.03.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.07.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
22.02.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.08.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.08.2010Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/20]
Appeal following opposition29.09.2006Appeal received No.  T1511/06
19.12.2006Statement of grounds filed
25.09.2008Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
25.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9102890  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 19 * * page 7, line 17 - line 22 * * page 9, line 1 - line 29; figure - *;
 [X]EP0315794  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column W *;
 [X]EP0596392  (WEBER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 52; figure - *;
 [A]US5094212  (KAWAGUCHI YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 54; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH06235334  ;
 [A]EP0317813  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]DE3405935  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] * sentence .. *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941122), vol. 18, no. 613, Database accession no. (M - 1709), & JP06235334 A 19940823 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *
by applicantJPS618441