Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1050674 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1050674



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 837
24.04.2013 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
11.04.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
14.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Request for change of name -opponent Search / examination 1
01.06.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
20.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
12.08.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
12.08.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.08.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.02.2010 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.02.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 12
17.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2010 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.08.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.08.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
31.07.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.06.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
12.06.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.06.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.01.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.01.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 24
24.10.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
26.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
23.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.09.2008 Claims Appeal 1
08.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.09.2008 Claims Appeal 1
05.09.2008 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
05.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.09.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
01.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
28.08.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.08.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
26.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
26.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
25.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
15.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.05.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
09.05.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.04.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.04.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2008 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
14.03.2008 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
11.03.2008 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
11.03.2008 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
16.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
07.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 19
11.09.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
07.09.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.09.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.07.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
09.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
18.06.2007 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
14.06.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
14.06.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
30.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
27.12.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.12.2006 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
14.11.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.10.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.10.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
16.08.2006 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
16.08.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.07.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
12.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 83
12.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 44
12.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
24.01.2006 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.01.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
07.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.03.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
01.03.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.02.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
11.02.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
05.02.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.01.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.01.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
16.01.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.04.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.12.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
13.09.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
04.09.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.05.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.05.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.05.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
08.05.2002 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
19.04.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
14.03.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
01.03.2002 Description Search / examination 13
01.03.2002 Description Search / examination 1
01.03.2002 Drawings Search / examination 4
01.03.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.12.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.10.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2000 Priority document Search / examination 16
17.10.2000 Priority document Search / examination 17
17.10.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 27
17.10.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
16.10.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.10.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
27.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.08.2000 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
08.08.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
08.08.2000 Description Search / examination 18
08.08.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.08.2000 Drawings Search / examination 6
08.08.2000 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
08.08.2000 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7