Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1073152

EP1073152 - Socket for electrical parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enplas Corporation
30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
ENPLAS CORPORATION
30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
ENPLAS CORPORATION
30-1, Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohashi, Yoshiyuki, c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1, Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116313.827.07.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateJP1999021628630.07.1999         Original published format: JP 21628699
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1073152
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1073152
Date:24.07.2002
[2002/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1073152
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/10, H01L23/32
[2002/30]
Former International [2001/05]H01R13/193
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/16]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufnahmesockel für elektronische Bauteile[2006/02]
English:Socket for electrical parts[2001/05]
French:Socle pour composants électroniques[2001/05]
Former [2001/05]Steckdose für elektronische Bauteile
Examination procedure09.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/12]
25.01.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.05.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
15.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2006Fee for grant paid
11.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.03.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
GB07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/50]IT07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
GB07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
Former [2007/37]IT07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DE08.09.2006
Former [2007/35]IT07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
Former [2007/19]NL07.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH10172702  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS JAPAN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH1126126  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS JAPAN) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH11111418  (LG SEMICON CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *