Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077195

EP1077195 - Rope length gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fernsteuergeräte Kurt Oelsch GmbH
Jahnstrasse 68-72
12347 Berlin / DE
[2001/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schulz, Klaus-Dieter
Ilgenweg 11a
12349 Berlin / DE
02 / Neumann, Thomas
Rehagener Strasse 36
12307 Berlin / DE
03 / Donner, Uwe
Am alten Friedhof 45A
12524 Berlin / DE
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Weisse, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Jürgen Weisse Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Rudolf Wolgast Bökenbusch 41
42555 Velbert-Langenberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Jürgen Weisse Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Rudolf Wolgast Bökenbusch 41
42555 Velbert-Langenberg / DE
Application number, filing date00116347.628.07.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateDE199913922319.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19939223
[2001/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077195
Date:21.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077195
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65H75/44
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   FI,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/46]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Seillängengeber[2001/08]
English:Rope length gauge[2001/08]
French:Capteur de longueur de corde[2001/08]
Examination procedure04.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
17.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DY]DE29716524U  (OELSCH FERNSTEUERGERAETE [DE]) [DY] 1,8,9 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 13; figure - *;
 [Y]DE3803919  (INTERATOM [DE]) [Y] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 16 - line 21 * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 20; figure 1 *