EP1081521 - Kinematic lens mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watson, Douglas C., c/o Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
Novak, Thomas W., c/o Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116461.5 | 29.07.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990386255 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 386255 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081521 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081521 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081521 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G03F7/20 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G03F7/70241 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/026 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/028 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70825 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Kinematische Linsenhalterung | [2001/10] | English: | Kinematic lens mounting | [2001/10] | French: | Monture cinématique de lentille | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2006 | BE | 19.04.2006 | CH | 19.04.2006 | CY | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | FR | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | LI | 19.04.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | GB | 29.07.2006 | LU | 29.07.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | IE | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.07.2006 | ||
LU | 29.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GB | 29.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 19.07.2006 | |
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS58159509 ; | [XA]JPS58187907 ; | [X]US2808762 (GRAVE JR CHARLES J DE) [X] 1-11 * column W *; | [X]DE1262041 (VOIGTLAENDER AG) [X] 8-11 * column 3, line 13 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [DXA]US4733945 (BACICH JOHN J [US]) [DX] 8-11 * column 6, line 46 - line 68; figure 4 * [A] 1-6; | [E]EP1026532 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [E] 1-6,8-11 * column 1, line 27 - line 36 * * column 3, line 1 - line 19 ** figures 1,2 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831221), vol. 007, no. 286, Database accession no. (P - 244), & JP58159509 A 19830921 (OLYMPUS KOGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 8-11 * abstract * [A] 1-7 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840214), vol. 008, no. 033, Database accession no. (P - 254), & JP58187907 A 19831102 (OLYMPUS KOGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 8-11 * abstract * [A] 1-7 |