EP1074963 - Protective label for coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wölfle, Dieter Belchenweg 16 71139 Ehningen / DE | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Hössle, Markus Hössle Kudlek & Partner Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] |
Former [2001/06] | Hössle & Kudlek Patentanwälte Diemershaldenstrasse 23 70184 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116492.0 | 31.07.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | DE1999213747U | 06.08.1999 Original published format: DE 29913747 U | [2001/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074963 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074963 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074963 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
G09F3/0291 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | G09F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | Lackierschutzetikett | [2001/06] | English: | Protective label for coating | [2001/06] | French: | Etiquette protective pour laquage | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2004
06.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Stoff + Stoff GmbH Schubertweg 44 31737 Rinteln / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2004
06.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Stoff + Stoff GmbH Schubertweg 44 31737 Rinteln / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2004
06.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Stoff + Stoff GmbH Schubertweg 44 31737 Rinteln / DE Opponent's representative Göken, Klaus G. (DE) Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | 29.07.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.11.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.03.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.09.2003 | FI | 24.09.2003 | FR | 24.09.2003 | GB | 24.09.2003 | IE | 24.09.2003 | IT | 24.09.2003 | NL | 24.09.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | SE | 24.12.2003 | ES | 04.01.2004 | PT | 24.02.2004 | AT | 31.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | LU | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
IT | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
AT | 31.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
AT | 31.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
AT | 31.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
AT | 31.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
FR | 08.10.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GB | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
IE | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 24.09.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 24.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4135492 (UNIPRESS OLAF KIERCHNER [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9602434 (PILLSBURY CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 4-8; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE29614833U (SCHREINER ETIKETTEN [DE]) [DA] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE29913747U (WOELFLE DIETER [DE]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document * |