Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049320

EP1049320 - Initiating a link between computers based on the decoding of an address steganographically embedded in an audio object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/44]Computer linking methods employing audio or visual data objects
[2002/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digimarc Corporation
19801 SW 72nd Avenue, Suite 250 Tualatin
Oregon 97062 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Digimarc Corporation
19801 SW 72nd Avenue, Suite 250
Tualatin, Oregon 97062 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rhoads, Geoffrey B.
304 S.W. Tualatin Loop
West Linn, Oregon 97068 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Meddle, Alan L.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Meddle, Alan Leonard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116604.007.05.1996
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateUS1995043610208.05.1995         Original published format: US 436102
US1995050808327.07.1995         Original published format: US 508083
US1995051299309.08.1995         Original published format: US 512993
US1995053400525.09.1995         Original published format: US 534005
US1996063753125.04.1996         Original published format: US 637531
[2001/15]
Former [2000/44]US1995043610208.05.1995
US1995050808327.07.1995
US1995051299309.08.1995
US1995053400525.09.1995
US1996063553125.04.1996
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049320
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1049320
Date:02.05.2001
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049320
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Verbindungsherstellung zwischen Computern beruhend auf der Dekodierung einer steganographisch in einem Audioobjekt eingebetteten Adresse[2002/17]
English:Initiating a link between computers based on the decoding of an address steganographically embedded in an audio object[2002/17]
French:Initialisation d'une liaison entre ordinateurs basée sur le décodage d'une adresse enrobée stéganographiquement dans un objet audio.[2002/17]
Former [2000/44]Verfahren zur Verbindung von Rechnern durch Gebrauch von audio oder visuellen Datenobjekten
Former [2000/44]Computer linking methods employing audio or visual data objects
Former [2000/44]Procédés pour lier des ordinateurs, employant des objets de données audio ou visuelles
Examination procedure01.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
01.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2002Fee for grant paid
21.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96917808.6  / EP0824821
Opposition(s)03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.01.2003
BE02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IT02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
IE07.05.2003
LU07.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2005/02]AT02.01.2003
BE02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
IE07.05.2003
LU07.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/39]AT02.01.2003
BE02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
IE07.05.2003
LU07.05.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/29]AT02.01.2003
BE02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
IE07.05.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/10]AT02.01.2003
BE02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]AT02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/02]AT02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
DK02.04.2003
PT02.04.2003
Former [2003/47]AT02.01.2003
CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
Former [2003/46]CH02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
Former [2003/43]CH02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
Former [2003/40]CH02.01.2003
LI02.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9510813  (TSAI IRVING [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0581317  (INTERACTIVE HOME SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 17 * abstract *
 [A]  - BENDER W ET AL, "TECHNIQUES FOR DATA HIDING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE,US,SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, (1995), vol. 2420, pages 164 - 173, XP000566794 [A] 1,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.205315