Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081964

EP1081964 - Liquid crystal projection display system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2011  [2011/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/06]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Huang, Austin Lancelot
19402 SE 9th Circle
Camas, WA 98607 / US
02 / Florence, James M.
16059 SW Waxwing Way
Beaverton, OR 97007 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116630.501.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS1999036694304.08.1999         Original published format: US 366943
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081964
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081964
Date:14.07.2004
[2004/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1081964
Date:10.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/06]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1081964
Date:14.07.2010
[2010/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/31, G02F1/13357
[2009/34]
Former International [2001/10]H04N9/31
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/14]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristall-Projektionsanzeigesystem[2001/10]
English:Liquid crystal projection display system[2001/10]
French:Système d'affichage par projection à cristaux liquides[2001/10]
Examination procedure17.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
24.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2009Fee for grant paid
16.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
26.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US5517340  (DOANY FUAD E [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 19 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US5921650  (DOANY FUAD ELIAS [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * column 4, line 25 - line 56 * * column 7, line 33 - column 9, line 46 * * figures 3,13-15 *;
 [A]US5357288  (HIROSHIMA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 9, line 7 - column 11, line 52 * * figures 4,5 *