Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074870

EP1074870 - Device for stripping of coated cables [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CCS Technology, Inc.
103 Foulk Road
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
[2002/04]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
SCC Special Communication Cables GmbH & Co. KG
Postfach 70 03 09
81303 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reichstätter, Erwin
Schillerstrasse 15
96465 Neustadt / DE
02 / Engel, Matthias
Steinachtal Strasse 11
96242 Sonnefeld / DE
03 / Zhan, Gao, Dr.-Ing.
Neustadt Strasse 11
96450 Coburg / DE
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Quermann & Richardt, Unter den Eichen 7
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2001/50]Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing.
Corning Cable Systems GmbH & Co. KG, Patentabteilung, Kistlerhofstrasse 170
81379 München / DE
Former [2001/06]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116725.302.08.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateDE199913634502.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19936345
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1074870
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1074870
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Abisolieren von unmantelten Kabeln[2001/06]
English:Device for stripping of coated cables[2001/06]
French:Dispositif pour le dénudage de câbles revêtus[2001/06]
Examination procedure10.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
02.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
05.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0682273  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 5 - column 7, line 37; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-12;
 [XA]DE4236251  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 56; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-12