Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076239

EP1076239 - Process for the coating of capillaries with cross-linked hydrophilic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/07]Coating with cross-linked hydrophilic polymers
[2003/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Studiengesellschaft Kohle mbH
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Platz 1
45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE
[2001/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Belder, Detlev, Dr.
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Platz 1
45470 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE
02 / Husmann, Heribert
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Platz 1
45470 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00116757.603.08.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateDE199913800211.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19938002
[2001/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1076239
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1076239
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076239
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/447
[2001/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Kapillaren mit quervernetzten hydrophilen Polymeren[2003/05]
English:Process for the coating of capillaries with cross-linked hydrophilic polymers[2003/05]
French:Procédé pour le revêtement des capillaires avec des polymères hydrophiles réticulés[2003/05]
Former [2001/07]Beschichtung mit quervernetzten hydrophilen Polymeren
Former [2001/07]Coating with cross-linked hydrophilic polymers
Former [2001/07]Revêtement en polymères hydrophiles réticulés
Examination procedure03.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
03.03.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
21.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2003Fee for grant paid
12.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.09.2003
FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
IT24.09.2003
DK24.12.2003
GR24.12.2003
ES04.01.2004
PT24.02.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY24.09.2003
FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
IT24.09.2003
DK24.12.2003
GR24.12.2003
ES04.01.2004
Former [2007/08]CY24.09.2003
FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
DK24.12.2003
GR24.12.2003
ES04.01.2004
Former [2004/46]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
DK24.12.2003
GR24.12.2003
ES04.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
DK24.12.2003
GR24.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI24.09.2003
IE24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI24.09.2003
GR24.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI24.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9623221  (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13,15-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US4796700  (SANDIFORD BURTON B [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9920378  (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 5 * * page 13, line 2 - line 10 *;
 [A]US5322608  (KARGER BARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0587156  (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *