EP1083631 - Connector in which a FPC is tightly held between a housing and a movable actuator when being connected to the connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LIMITED 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LIMITED 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudo, Takaaki, Japan Aviation Electronics Ind. Ltd 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116784.0 | 03.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | JP19990230376 | 17.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23037699 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083631 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083631 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/24, H01R12/16 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
H01R12/88 (EP,KR,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2001/49] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbinder in dem ein Flachbandkabel, wenn verbunden mit dem Verbinder, zwischen einem Gehäuse und einem Betätiger geklemmt ist | [2001/11] | English: | Connector in which a FPC is tightly held between a housing and a movable actuator when being connected to the connector | [2001/11] | French: | Connecteur dans lequel un circuit imprimé flexible, lorsque connecté avec le connecteur, est tenu serré entre un boîtier et un actionneur mobile | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4630874 (RENN ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 10 - column 8, line 58; figures 3-5 *; | [A] - RYUICHI TAKAYASU, "FH12 CONNECTOR SERIES FOR FPCS, FFCS INCREASES CIRCUIT DESIGN FREEDOM", JEE JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING,JP,DEMPA PUBLICATIONS INC. TOKYO, (19950901), vol. 32, no. 345, ISSN 0385-4507, pages 31 - 33, XP000526630 [A] 1,7 * figures 1-3 * |