Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074232

EP1074232 - Photocoagulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi
Aichi 443-0035 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0035 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Abe, Hitoshi
28, Gonishi, Nikki-cho
Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-2148 / JP
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date00116798.003.08.2000
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateJP1999022189405.08.1999         Original published format: JP 22189499
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1074232
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074232
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/008
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2001/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Photokoagulation[2001/06]
English:Photocoagulation apparatus[2001/06]
French:Dispositif de photocoagulation[2001/06]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
29.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
08.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.12.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
26.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2002Fee for grant paid
08.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3607721  (RODENSTOCK INSTR [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 2 - line 66; claims 1-3,6,8-11,14,15 *;
 [X]US4741612  (BIRNGRUBER REGINALD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, paragraph 3 *;
 [XA]US4758081  (BARNES CLARENCE W [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10 * column 6, paragraph 3 * [A] 5;
 [X]EP0697611  (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * claims 15,16,20 *;
 [A]GB2317227  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * page 21, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 *;
 [A]US5923399  (VAN DE VELDE FRANS J [US]);
 [A]DE19635998  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0363221  (SPECTRA PHYSICS [US])