Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047100

EP1047100 - X-Ray tube having rotary anode cooled with high thermal conductivity fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Varian Medical Systems, Inc.
3100 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Anderson, Wetson A.
763 Lapara Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / Arnold, James T.
778 Blanchard Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / Lavering, Gordon R.
411 Skymont Drive
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
04 / Duffield, Jack J.
878 Helena Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Foster, Mark Charles , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/22]Foster, Mark Charles , et al
Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Former [2002/20]Foster, Mark Charles , et al
Mathisen & Macara The Coach House 6-8 Swakeley's Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BX / GB
Former [2002/19]Foster, Mark Charles
Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Former [2000/43]Foster, Mark Charles
Edward Evans & Co., Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BX / GB
Application number, filing date00116849.109.01.1995
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateUS1994017902307.01.1994         Original published format: US 179023
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047100
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1047100
Date:12.02.2003
[2003/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01J35/10
[2003/07]
Former International [2000/43]H01J35/10, H05G1/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/43]
TitleGerman:Röntgenröhre mit einer durch eine Flüssigkeit mit hohen Wärmeleitfähigkeit gekühlten Drehanode[2000/43]
English:X-Ray tube having rotary anode cooled with high thermal conductivity fluid[2000/43]
French:Tube à rayon X à anode tournante refroidie par un fluide à forte conductivité thermique[2000/43]
Examination procedure04.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
01.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
12.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/10]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95906158.1  / EP0688468
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200309   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE3644719  (IHRINGER JOERG DR) [DX] 1,18,41,51 * column 3, line 49 - line 62; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5077781  (IVERSEN ARTHUR H [US]) [A] 41,54 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4592557  (IVERSEN ARTHUR H [US]) [A] 41,54 * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2686732  (GEN ELECTRIC CGR [FR]) [A] 1,6,18,33 * claim 1 *