Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1075813

EP1075813 - Shield for gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.C. Bradley Company
1017 Front Avenue Columbus
Georgia 31904 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
W.C. Bradley Company
1017 Front Avenue
Columbus, Georgia 31904 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Craven, Joseph Braxton
6 Eden Court
Columbus, Georgia 31904 / US
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1
37073 Göttingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Rehberg Hüppe + Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62
37021 Göttingen / DE
Former [2001/07]Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe
Am Kirschberge 22
37085 Göttingen / DE
Application number, filing date00117144.610.08.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateUS19990148685P12.08.1999         Original published format: US 148685 P
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1075813
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47J37/07
[2001/07]
Designated contracting statesGB [2001/44]
Former [2001/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schirm für Gasbrenner[2001/07]
English:Shield for gas burner[2001/07]
French:Ecran pour brûleur à gaz[2001/07]
Examination procedure14.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
15.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
02.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.10.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5878739  (GUIDRY GREGG A [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,9,12,13 * column 3, line 20 - line 33; figures 2,5 *;
 [A]US5368009  (JONES RICHARD R [US]) [A] 1,3,6,7,10,13 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 11; figure 2 *