Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077512

EP1077512 - Electrical plug connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
FCI
145/147 rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2007/28]For all designated states
F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International
Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International
Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL
Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / May, Guntram
Logaustrasse 4
90518 Altdorf / DE
02 / Müller, Steffen
Leerstetterstrasse 98
90469 Nuernberg / DE
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Hess, Peter K. G. , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Hess, Peter K. G. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Hess, Peter K. G. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/03]Hess, Peter K. G. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2001/08]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00117252.714.08.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateDE199913893017.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19938930
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077512
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1077512
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077512
Date:15.05.2002
[2002/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077512
Date:11.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/629
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Steckverbinder[2001/08]
English:Electrical plug connector[2001/08]
French:Connecteur électrique à fiche[2001/08]
Examination procedure04.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
16.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2007Fee for grant paid
29.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
CY11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
IE14.08.2007
LU14.08.2007
IT31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
GB11.10.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
[2011/12]
Former [2009/37]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
CY11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
IE14.08.2007
LU14.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
GB11.10.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2009/33]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
CY11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
IE14.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
GB11.10.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2009/03]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
IE14.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
GB11.10.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/45]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
IE14.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/28]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/23]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
MC31.08.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/19]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/13]AT11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/09]NL11.07.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5628642  (BIERINGER ANTON [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 44 - line 63; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,8,9;
 [YA]US5839912  (SCHEKALLA PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1;
 [YA]DE9205659U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * figures 1,5; claim 1 * [A] 1;
 [YA]EP0717466  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 9 * column 11, line 29 - line 37; figures 1,4 * * column 12, line 16 - line 38 * [A] 1;
 [A]DE29908612U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 32; figures 2B,2C *