EP1077162 - Wire harness circuit configuration method and wire harness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? GR | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Masami, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 159-1, Kaminokiri, Fukuju-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 470-1241 / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Yutaka, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 159-1, Kaminokiri, Fukuju-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 470-1241 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Mitsutoshi, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 159-1, Kaminokiri, Fukuju-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 470-1241 / JP | 04 /
Seki, Yoshinobu, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 159-1, Kaminokiri, Fukuju-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 470-1241 / JP | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117290.7 | 17.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | JP19990231899 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23189999 | JP19990231864 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23186499 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077162 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077162 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1077162 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B60R16/0207 (EP,US);
H01B7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | Kabelbaumschaltkonfigurationsmethode und Kabelbaum | [2001/08] | English: | Wire harness circuit configuration method and wire harness | [2001/08] | French: | Méthode de configuration de circuit de faisceau de cables et faisceau de cables | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Request for further processing for: | 27.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.07.2006 | [2008/19] |
Former [2007/45] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 05.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3341745 (JAMES MUNRO GEOFFREY HECTOR) [A] 1,4,6-14* the whole document *; | [A]US5057026 (SAWAI MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5501605 (OZAKI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5805402 (MAUE H WINSTON [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |