Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077462

EP1077462 - Trip device for a circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB PATENT GmbH
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[2001/42]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eppe, Klaus-Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Leutweinstrasse 6
69429 Waldbrunn / DE
02 / Weber, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing.
Wieblinger Weg 52
69123 Heidelberg / DE
03 / Schmitt, Volker
Ringstrasse 41
69245 Bammental / DE
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH
Postfach 1140
68520 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date00117417.611.08.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateDE199913896517.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19938965
[2001/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077462
Date:21.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077462
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077462
Date:06.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01H71/74
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
Extension statesSI31.08.2000
TitleGerman:Auslöseeinrichtung für einen elektrischen Installationsschalter[2004/01]
English:Trip device for a circuit breaker[2001/08]
French:Déclencheur pour un disjoncteur[2001/08]
Former [2001/08]Aulöseeinrichtung für einen elektrischen Installationsschalter
Examination procedure13.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
21.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2003Fee for grant paid
01.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
AT11.08.2004
LU11.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
PT06.10.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]CY06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
AT11.08.2004
LU11.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2006/13]FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
AT11.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/51]FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/25]FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/19]FI06.05.2004
IE06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI06.05.2004
SE06.08.2004
ES17.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE06.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3245562  (OPPACH SCHALTELEKTRONIK [DD]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 23 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0902453  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 36 - line 43; figure 1 * * page 2, column 2, line 22 - line 25; figure 1 * * page 2, column 2, line 48 - line 50; figure 1 *