EP1077122 - Tire vulcanizing method and tire vulcanizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitamura, Hisashi, Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117633.8 | 16.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | JP19990230227 | 17.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23022799 | JP19990234989 | 23.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23498999 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077122 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077122 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/04, B29C43/10, B29C43/14, B29D30/06 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
B29C35/02 (KR);
B29C35/0266 (EP,US);
B29C35/04 (EP,US);
B29D30/0005 (EP,US);
B29D30/0601 (EP,US);
B29D30/0645 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0283 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C35/045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | Vulkanisierverfahren und -vorrichtung für Luftreifen | [2001/08] | English: | Tire vulcanizing method and tire vulcanizer | [2001/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil de vulcanisation de pneus | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0604984 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-13,16,18 * column 7, line 3 - line 39; figure 5 * * column 10, line 4 - line 11 * * claim 8 * * claims 12,18 * [Y] 6,19; | [Y]US3640653 (LAENEN NICHOLAS M, et al) [Y] 6,19 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE1208878 (DEUTSCHE DUNLOP GUMMI CIE AG) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 6,20; | [X]US3922122 (BOTTASSO FRANCO, et al) [X] 1,6,20 * column 4, line 9 - line 16; figure 2 *; | [X]US3741696 (GREENWOOD A) [X] 1,6,7,20 * column 3, line 7 - line 13; figure 1 * * column 5, line 15 - line 26 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 2 * * column 6, line 30 - line 47 * * figures 3-8 *; | [X]US3712769 (CIMPRICH F) [X] 8-13,16-19 * column 1, line 41 - line 44 * * column 2, line 49 - line 68; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 49 * * column 4, line 53 - line 54 *; | [X]DE4434270 (HERBERT REIFENBAUMAS GMBH [DE]) [X] 12-14,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0928679 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 8,10-13,16-19 * column 1, line 3 - line 17 * * column 4, line 25 - line 31 * * column 7, line 18 - line 56; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4456806 (ARIMATSU TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 8-13,16-19 * column 1, line 7 - column 14 * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 33 * * column 4, line 22 - line 31 *; | [X]US3566066 (BORTHWICK JOHN B, et al) [X] 8-13,17-19 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 12 *; | [X]US3824048 (GETZ G) [X] 11-13,15-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US4525320 (SARUMARU KAZUMASA [JP]) [X] 8,10-13,15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0468342 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 12,13,15-19 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 26 - line 35; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 51 *; | [X]JPS6186219 ; | JPS6186219 [ ] (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [ ] * figures 1-3 *; | [PX]EP0976534 (PIRELLI [IT]) [PX] 12-14,17-19 * claims 1-3 * * page 3, line 27 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0549317 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1,6,20 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860905), & JP61086219 A 19860501 (TOYO RUBBER) [X] 12,13,15,18,19 * abstract * |