Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077460

EP1077460 - Circuit breaker with trip unit mounted tripping latch plunger and latch therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center Cleveland
Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mueller, Robert William
212 Littell Road
Alliquipa, Pennsylvania 15001 / US
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2001/08]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00117720.317.08.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateUS1999037681618.08.1999         Original published format: US 376816
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077460
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077460
Date:09.01.2002
[2002/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01H71/50
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/39]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Scutzschalter mit einem in der Auslöseeinheit eingebauten Auslösestössel und Verriegelung dafür[2001/08]
English:Circuit breaker with trip unit mounted tripping latch plunger and latch therefore[2001/08]
French:Disjoncteur avec un plongeur de déclenchement monté dans le module de déclenchement et verrou correspondant[2001/08]
Examination procedure05.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
13.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/26]
21.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4806893  (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 13; figures 2,3,5 *;
 [Y]US5117210  (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 5; figures 2,5 *;
 [X]US3460075  (YORGIN NICK, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 70; figure - *;
 [A]US5418343  (FABER TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0255955  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR52538E  (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *