Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077054

EP1077054 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2005  [2005/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
First Quality Enterprises, Inc.
Clinton County Industrial Park, North Road
McElhattan, Pennsylvania 17748 / US
[2001/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Damaghi, Kambiz
9 Farmers Road
Kings Point, New York 11021 / US
02 / Turi, Mordechai
P.O. Box 383
Conyngham, PA 18219 / US
03 / Kauschke, Michael
1116 Warburton Avenue
Yonkers, New York 10701 / US
04 / Karami, Hamzeh
P.O. Box 252
McElhattan, PA 17748 / US
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Motsch, Andreas
Patentanwalt
St-Anna-Platz 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Motsch, Andreas
Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00117745.017.08.2000
[2001/08]
Priority number, dateUS1999037628218.08.1999         Original published format: US 376282
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077054
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1077054
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/49, A61F13/64, A61F13/56, A61F13/15
[2001/44]
Former International [2001/08]A61F13/49, A61F13/64
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:Absorbierender Artikel[2001/08]
English:Absorbent article[2001/08]
French:Article absorbant[2001/08]
Examination procedure19.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/35]
04.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0985398  (FIRST QUALITY PRODUCTS INC) [PX] 1-14 * figures 1-22; claims 1-14 *;
 [X]EP0832628  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [X] 1-3,5-7,13,14 * column 5, line 10 - column 9, line 40 * * column 12, line 4 - column 13, line 5 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US5137526  (COATES FREDRICA) [X] 1-14 * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 43 * * figures 1-18 *;
 [X]EP0528282  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [X] 1-3,5-7,13-22 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 26 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US5445628  (GIPSON WILLIAM P ET AL) [X] 20-22 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB2263224  (FENTON JACQUELINE ANNE MARGARE) [X] 15,20 * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US5906604  (CARLBARK OLLE ET AL) [X] 20 * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US4675918  (O'BRIEN ANN N) [X] 23-26 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB888827  (YECHESKEL PREISER;MARGIT FUCHS) [A] 23 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5695488  (SOSALLA PAULA MARY) [A] 23 * figures 7-11 *;
 [A]US2493113  (GELIMANN DANCE BARBARA) [A] 23 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US4995873  (KNIGHT JACKILYN M) [A] 23 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5368585  (DOKKEN GLENDA K) [A] 23 * figures 1-4 *