Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101675

EP1101675 - Process and device for adjusting the braking effect in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2011
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2010/27]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Poggenburg, Rüdiger
Jaegerstrasse 27
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
02 / Diehle, Stefan
Frankenstrasse 13
70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE
03 / Sonntag, Eberhard
Enzpark 19
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
 [2007/42]
Former [2001/21]01 / Poggenburg, Rüdiger
Jaegerstrasse 27
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
02 / Diehle, stfean
Frankenstrasse 13
70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE
Application number, filing date00117765.818.08.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateDE199915524317.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19955243
[2001/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101675
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101675
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101675
Date:07.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/1764
[2010/16]
Former International [2001/21]B60T8/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Bremswirkung bei einem Kraftfahrzeug[2001/21]
English:Process and device for adjusting the braking effect in a vehicle[2001/21]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'ajustement de l'effet de freinage dans un véhicule[2001/21]
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
03.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2010Fee for grant paid
19.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB07.10.2010
ES18.10.2010
[2011/43]
Former [2011/31]ES18.10.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US4637664  (ARIKAWA TETSURO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 20 *;
 [A]EP0878367  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 11 * * figures 8A,8B *;
 [A]US4893880  (ARIKAWA TETSURO [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,10 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 49 *;
 [A]GB2307526  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 11 * * claim 14 *;
 [A]DE4410937  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,4-6,9,10 * claim 1 *