Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081834

EP1081834 - Methods of operating step-up DC current converters and step-up DC voltage converters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/10]Methods of operating step-up DC voltage converters and step-up DC voltage converters
[2003/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Haggertystrasse 1
85356 Freising / DE
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Eckart
Scheinerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
02 / Scoones, Kevin
Notburga-Strasse 4
80639 München / DE
03 / Bayer, Erich
Am Blankenfeld 15
84030 Ergolding / DE
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/12]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Former [2001/10]Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date00118132.028.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateDE199914041926.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19940419
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081834
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081834
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1081834
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/158
[2001/51]
Former International [2001/10]H02M3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb von Aufwärtsgleichstromwandlern und Aufwärtsgleichstromwandler[2003/18]
English:Methods of operating step-up DC current converters and step-up DC voltage converters[2003/18]
French:Procédés pour opérer des convertisseurs à courant continu et des convertisseurs à courant continu[2003/18]
Former [2001/10]Verfahren zum Betrieb von Aufwärtsgleichstromumwandlern und Aufwärtsgleichspannungsumwandlern
Former [2001/10]Methods of operating step-up DC voltage converters and step-up DC voltage converters
Former [2001/10]Procédés pour opérer des convertisseurs à courant continu amplifiants et des convertisseurs à tension continue amplifiants
Examination procedure28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/35]
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2003Fee for grant paid
04.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
FR29.10.2003
IT29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
PT29.03.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
FR29.10.2003
IT29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2007/08]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
FR29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2006/14]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
FR29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/52]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/46]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/41]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
NL29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI29.10.2003
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE29.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0617501  (LINEAR TECHN INC [US]) [AD] 1,2,6,8 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 3 * * figure 2 * * column 18, line 25 - line 36 *;
 [A]DE19725440  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE29605699U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,8 * page 2, line 6 - line 16 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 2 *