Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080731

EP1080731 - Composition and device structure for iontophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2005  [2005/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC.
408, Tashirodaikanmachi Tosu-shi
Saga-ken 841-0017 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO. INC.
408, Tashirodaikanmachi
Tosu-shi, Saga-ken 841-0017 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Adachi, Hirotoshi, Pharmaceutical Co., Inc.
Tsukuba Lab of Hisamitsu, 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP
02 / Kuzumaki, Noriyuki, Pharmaceutical Co., Inc.
Tsukuba Lab of Hisamitsu, 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP
03 / Arimoto, Tetsuya, Pharmaceutical Co., Inc.
Tsukuba Lab of Hisamitsu, 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP
04 / Higo, Naruhito, Pharmaceutical Co., Inc.
Tsukuba Lab of Hisamitsu, 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00118135.329.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateJP1999024697201.09.1999         Original published format: JP 24697299
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1080731
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1080731
Date:04.04.2001
[2001/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/32, A61N1/30, A61K9/00
[2001/14]
Former International [2001/10]A61K47/32, A61N1/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzung und Vorrichtung zur Iontophorese[2001/10]
English:Composition and device structure for iontophoresis[2001/10]
French:Composition et structure d'un dispositif pour ionophorèse[2001/10]
Examination procedure03.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/39]
08.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5648399  (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10-13 * column 8, line 6 - line 15 * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 2 * * column 23; example 6 * * column 38; example 21 *;
 [X]EP0577034  (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,13 * page 2, line 45 - line 53 * * page 3, line 13 - line 57 * * page 6; examples 2,3,5 * * claims 1,2,5,6,10 *;
 [T]WO0062857  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [T] 1-16 * page 18, line 14 - page 22, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9712644  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 9, line 18 - page 15, line 8 *
by applicantJPH09235230
 WO9634597
 EP0357061
 EP0359036
 EP0386667
 EP0415294
 US3853837
 US4008209