Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083625

EP1083625 - Frequency selective reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Los Angeles
CA 90067-2199 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chandler, Charles W.
119 South California Street No. 5
San Gabriel, CA 91776 / US
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00118148.629.08.2000
[2001/11]
Priority number, dateUS1999039311610.09.1999         Original published format: US 393116
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1083625
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1083625
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01Q15/00, H01Q19/195, H01Q5/00
[2003/01]
Former International [2001/11]H01Q15/00, H01Q19/195
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2001/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Frequenzselektiver Reflektor[2001/11]
English:Frequency selective reflector[2001/11]
French:Réflecteur à surface sélective en fréquence[2001/11]
Examination procedure09.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
09.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT
27.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
02.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
13.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9910950  (KILDAL ANTENNA CONSULTING AB [SE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,3,11,19 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 10 * [A] 4,5,10;
 [XA]US4096483  (BUI HAI NHU, et al) [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 9-11;
 [XA]JPH0448804  (NEC CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 10;
 [XA]US4851858  (FRISCH EBERHARD [DE]) [X] 8 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 9-11;
 [PXA]EP1020953  (TRW INC [US]) [PX] 8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] , [0017] , [0026] * * figure 6 * [A] 9-11;
 [A]JPH0491503  (ARIMURA INST TECHNOLOGY) [A] 6-9,11 * abstract *