Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094265

EP1094265 - Clip with flexible locking arms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kwilosz, Mark J.
447 North Locust Street
Frankfort, Illinois 60423 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Vetter, Ewald Otto , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Vetter, Ewald Otto , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2001/17]Vetter, Ewald Otto , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date00118157.729.08.2000
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateUS1999042026118.10.1999         Original published format: US 420261
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1094265
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16L3/13
[2001/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2002/03]
Former [2001/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit weichen Verriegelungsarmen versehene Schelle[2001/17]
English:Clip with flexible locking arms[2001/17]
French:Bride avec bras de blocage souple[2001/17]
Examination procedure15.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
19.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
05.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29703643U  (BETTERMANN OBO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,7,9 * figure - *;
 [A]DE29701383U  (BETTERMANN OBO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,7,9 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2683885  (REHAU SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,7,9 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2040348  (ITW ESPANA SA) [A] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [A]US4541602  (POTZAS PETER [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figure . *
by applicantUS5782090
 US5704573
 US5618015
 US5533696