Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081793

EP1081793 - Electrical connector including means for terminating the shield of a high speed cable [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'Sullivan, Michael
77 Lake Hinsdale Drive Apt. 410B
Willowbrook, Illinois 60514 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Herden, Andreas F.
Blumbach - Zinngrebe PatentConsult Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Herden, Andreas F.
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date00118452.225.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS1999038610530.08.1999         Original published format: US 386105
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1081793
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/05, H01R4/18, H01R13/502
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/48]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit Schirmendverbindung für ein Hochfrequenzkabel[2001/10]
English:Electrical connector including means for terminating the shield of a high speed cable[2001/10]
French:Connecteur électrique comportant des moyens pour la terminaison du blindage d'un câble de haute fréquence[2001/10]
Examination procedure31.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
16.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5509827  (HUPPENTHAL JON M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,15,17 * column 5, line 40 - column 13, line 29; figures 7,13 * [Y] 5-9,19-22,24;
 [YD]US5304069  (BRUNKER DAVID L [US], et al) [YD] 5-7,19,21 * column 3, line 7 - column 6, line 52; figures 7-9 *;
 [Y]EP0518739  (LOGISTEL [FR]) [Y] 8,9,20 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 48; figures 1,10 *;
 [YD]US5725387  (O'SULLIVAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [YD] 22,24 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 61; figures 6-9 *;
 [A]US3958851  (EVANS ROBERT T) [A] 1,10,15 * column 3, line 42 - line 59; figures 1,4 *