Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057888

EP1057888 - Transparent solid detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO HONEY-CAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
5-13, Mishimaoka 1-chome Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567-8577 / JP
For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
SHISEIDO HONEY-CAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
5-13, Mishimaoka 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8577 / JP
For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishina, Tetsuo, c/o Shiseido Honey-Cake Industry
5-13, Mishimaoka 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8577 / JP
02 / Saito, Yoshinobu, c/o Shiseido Honey-Cake Industry
5-13, Mishimaoka 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8577 / JP
03 / Kishi, Nobuyuki, c/o Shiseido Hony-Cake Industry
5-13, Mishimaoka 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8577 / JP
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00118988.501.09.2000
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1057888
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1057888
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057888
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D9/00, C11D9/22, C11D9/32
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/49]C11D17/00, C11D9/00, C11D1/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/04]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Transparentes festes Reinigungsmittel[2000/49]
English:Transparent solid detergent composition[2000/49]
French:Composition détergente solide transparente[2000/49]
Examination procedure29.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
13.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2003Fee for grant paid
12.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09157690  ;
 [A]JPH09316486  ;
 [A]JPH09157689  ;
 [A]WO9503391  (UNICHEMA CHEMIE BV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, [A] 1 * abstract *